Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste de Chabot

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mende


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1740BornMarigny-Brizay
17 Apr 178545.1SelectedBishop of Saint-Claude, France
27 Jun 178545.3ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Claude, France
31 Jul 178545.4Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Claude, France
16 Sep 180161.5ResignedBishop of Saint-Claude, France
14 Apr 180262.1SelectedBishop of Mende, France
1 May 180262.1ConfirmedBishop of Mende, France
Dec 1804²64.7ResignedBishop of Mende, France
28 Apr 181979.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Mende, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste de Chabot:
Bishop Jean-Baptiste de Chabot (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mende

  • a bishop for 33.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 265
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1785, Number 29
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 169

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 16 Jan 2016