Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Di Falco

Bishop Emeritus of Sulmona-Valva


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1930 BornCasalincontrada
29 Jun 195323.1Ordained PriestPriest
25 May 198555.0AppointedBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy
14 Jul 198555.2Ordained BishopBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy
31 Aug 198555.3InstalledBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy
3 Apr 200776.9RetiredBishop of Sulmona-Valva, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Di Falco:
Bishop Giuseppe Di Falco (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Sulmona-Valva

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sulmona-Valva.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Apr 2007
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013