Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Wuchang [Wuchang]

Dioecesis Uciamensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Hankow [Hankou]
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Hwayuansan, Wuchang, Hubei, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Wuchang [Wuchang]
12 December 1923ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Wuchang [Wuchang] (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Wuchang [Wuchang]
31 May 1930ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Wuchang [Wuchang] Vicariate Apostolic of Wuchang [Wuchang]
Diocese of Wuchang [Wuchang]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Wuchang [Wuchang] Diocese of Wuchang [Wuchang]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Wuchang [Wuchang]
195011,2742,500,000.5%61925450423ap1951

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.6, 8 Jan 2013; data: 13 Jan 2013