Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francis Aidan Cardinal Gasquet, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archivist of the Vatican Secret Archive

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)

Priest of Order of Saint Benedict

Librarian of the Vatican Library


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1846Born
30 Sep 186720.9ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
8 Dec 187024.1Solemn VowsMember of Order of Saint Benedict
19 Dec 187125.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
25 May 191467.6Elevated to Cardinal
28 May 191467.6AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro
6 Dec 191569.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)
28 Nov 191771.1AppointedArchivist of the Vatican Secret Archive
9 May 191972.5AppointedLibrarian of the Vatican Library
18 Dec 192478.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)
5 Apr 192982.5DiedArchivist of the Vatican Secret Archive

MicroData Summary for Francis Aidan Gasquet (VIAF: 71382001)
Francis Aidan Cardinal Gasquet O.S.B. (born , died ) Archivist of Vatican Secret Archive

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSomers Town, Vicariate Apostolic of London District, England, Great Britain
Ordained PriestSt Gregory, Abbey, Downside, Somerset, Diocese of Clifton, England, Great Britain
Death PlaceApartment, Palazzo San Callisto, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)St. Gregory, Abbey, Downside, Somerset, Diocese of Clifton, England, Great Britain

  • a priest for 57.2 years
  • a cardinal for 14.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 25 May 1914
  • loc: CL, 4 Oct 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast