Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ambrosio Echebarria Arroita

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Barbastro-Monzón, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1922Born
29 Jun 194725.2Ordained PriestPriest
23 Sep 197452.4AppointedBishop of Barbastro, Spain
2 Nov 197452.5Ordained BishopBishop of Barbastro, Spain
29 Oct 199977.5RetiredBishop of Barbastro-Monzón, Spain
6 Dec 201088.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Barbastro-Monzón, Spain

MicroData Summary for Ambrosio Echebarria Arroita
Bishop Ambrosio Echebarria Arroita (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Barbastro-Monzón

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCeberio

  • a priest for 63.4 years
  • a bishop for 36.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018