Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel Dwatuka Wagi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Rumbek


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1925BornBandala
19 Dec 195329.0Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jan 197651.1AppointedBishop of Rumbek, South Sudan
13 Jun 197651.4Ordained BishopBishop of Rumbek, South Sudan
17 Jul 198257.5ResignedBishop of Rumbek, South Sudan
18 Feb 199065.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Rumbek, South Sudan

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Dwatuka Wagi:
Bishop Gabriel Dwatuka Wagi (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Rumbek

  • a priest for 36.2 years
  • a bishop for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 24 Dec 2013