Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vlastimil Kročil

Bishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1961 BornBrno
16 Jul 199433.1Ordained PriestPriest of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic
19 Mar 201553.8AppointedBishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic
13 Jun 201554.0Ordained BishopBishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Vlastimil Kročil:
Bishop Vlastimil Kročil (born ) Bishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Mar 2015
  • ob: CB, 24 Mar 2015
  • c2: CB, 17 May 2015
  • c34: CB, 10 Jun 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,505

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015