Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nikolaus Adames

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Luxembourg

Titular Archbishop of Cyrrhus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1813BornUlflingen
25 Aug 183925.7Ordained PriestPriest of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
2 Jun 184026.4IncardinatedPriest of Luxembourg
7 May 184834.4AppointedPro-Vicar Apostolic of Luxembourg
27 Mar 186349.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Luxembourg
27 Mar 186349.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Halicarnassus
29 Jun 186349.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Halicarnassus
30 Sep 187056.8AppointedBishop of Luxembourg
25 Dec 187057.0InstalledBishop of Luxembourg
27 Sep 188369.7ResignedBishop of Luxembourg
2 Nov 188369.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cyrrhus
13 Feb 188773.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Luxembourg

MicroData Summary for Nikolaus Adames:
Archbishop Nikolaus Adames (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Luxembourg

  • a priest for 47.5 years
  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 237, and Page 297
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 355

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013