Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Forrosuelo Du

Archbishop of Palo, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1954 Born
1 Jun 197924.6Ordained PriestPriest of Cebu, Philippines
21 Nov 199743.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cebu, Philippines
21 Nov 199743.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Timici
6 Jan 199843.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Timici
21 Apr 200146.5AppointedBishop of Dumaguete, Philippines
25 Feb 201257.3AppointedArchbishop of Palo, Philippines

MicroData Summary for John Forrosuelo Du
Archbishop John Forrosuelo Du (born ) Archbishop of Palo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBantayan
Ordained BishopCathedral, Cebu, Archdiocese of Cebu

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Palo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,219
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Feb 2012
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast