Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Oscar Jaime Llaneta Florencio

Bishop of Philippines, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1966 Born
3 Apr 199024.1Ordained PriestPriest of Palo, Philippines
3 Jul 201549.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cebu, Philippines
3 Jul 201549.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Lestrona
4 Sep 201549.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lestrona
6 Jul 201751.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Philippines, Military
2 Mar 201953.0AppointedBishop of Philippines, Military
3 Apr 201953.1InstalledBishop of Philippines, Military

MicroData Summary for Oscar Jaime Llaneta Florencio
Bishop Oscar Jaime Llaneta Florencio (born ) Bishop of Philippines, Military

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCapoocan, Archdiocese of Palo
Ordained BishopCathedral, Palo, Archdiocese of Palo

Please contact the Bishop through the Military Ordinariate of Philippines, Military.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Jul 2015
  • mn/ob: CB, 3 Jul 2015
  • ob: CB, 16 Jul 2015
  • c2+: CB, 31 Aug 2015
  • c2+: CB, 3 Sep 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,566
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Mar 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 20 Mar 2019

Quantcast