Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marvyn Abrea Maceda

Bishop of San Jose de Antique, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1969 Born
15 Sep 199526.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Naval, Philippines
29 May 199627.2Ordained PriestPriest of Naval, Philippines
7 Jan 201949.8AppointedBishop of San Jose de Antique, Philippines
2 Apr 201950.1Ordained BishopBishop of San Jose de Antique, Philippines
9 Apr 201950.1InstalledBishop of San Jose de Antique, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Marvyn Abrea Maceda
Bishop Marvyn Abrea Maceda (born ) Bishop of San Jose de Antique

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBilaran, Diocese of Palo
Ordained BishopOur Lady of the Most Holy Rosary, Cathedral, Naval, Diocese of Naval

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Jose de Antique.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Jan 2019
  • bd: CB, 7 Jan 2019
  • ob/i: CB, 13 Jan 2019
  • ob/i: CB, 29 Jan 2019
  • c2+: CB, 8 Mar 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 2 Apr 2019

Quantcast