Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Getúlio Teixeira Guimarães, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cornélio Procópio, Parana, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1937Born
4 Aug 196628.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
20 Dec 198043.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ponta Grossa, Parana, Brazil
20 Dec 198043.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tabbora
22 Mar 198143.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tabbora
26 Mar 198446.4AppointedBishop of Cornélio Procópio, Parana, Brazil
26 Mar 201476.4RetiredBishop of Cornélio Procópio, Parana, Brazil
1 Aug 202082.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Cornélio Procópio, Parana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Getúlio Teixeira Guimarães
Bishop Getúlio Teixeira Guimarães S.V.D. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cornélio Procópio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCipotânea, Archdiocese of Mariana, Minas Gerais
Ordained BishopSanta Ana, Cathedral, Ponta Grossa, Diocese of Ponta Grossa, Parana
Death PlaceUnimed, Hospital, Cornélio Procópio, Diocese of Cornélio Procópio, Parana
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, Cathedral, Cornélio Procópio, Diocese of Cornélio Procópio, Parana

  • a priest for 53.9 years
  • a bishop for 39.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 26 Mar 2014
  • d: CB, 1 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 2 Aug 2020

Quantcast