Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Winnibald Joseph Menezes

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Bombay

Titular Bishop of Thubursicum-Bure


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1916BornMangalore
20 Dec 194226.2Ordained PriestPriest
29 Nov 196751.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bombay, India
29 Nov 196751.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Thubursicum-Bure
3 Feb 196851.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thubursicum-Bure
10 Jul 197659.8ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Bombay, India
27 May 200285.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Bombay, India

MicroData Summary for Winnibald Joseph Menezes:
Bishop Winnibald Joseph Menezes (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Bombay

  • a priest for 59.4 years
  • a bishop for 34.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013