Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Paul Saldanha

Bishop of Mangalore, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1964 Born
6 May 199127.0Ordained PriestPriest of Mangalore, India
3 Jul 201854.1AppointedBishop of Mangalore, India
15 Sep 201854.3Ordained BishopBishop of Mangalore, India

MicroData Summary for Peter Paul Saldanha
Bishop Peter Paul Saldanha (born ) Bishop of Mangalore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKinnigoli, Diocese of Mangalore
Ordained BishopGrounds, Our Lady of the Holy Rosary, Cathedral, Mangalore, Diocese of Mangalore

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mangalore.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Jul 2018
  • ob: CB, 13 Jul 2018
  • c2+: CB, 20 Aug 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 15 Sep 2018

Quantcast