Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Martin Dougherty

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Scranton, Pennsylvania, USA

Titular Bishop of Sufetula


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Apr 1932 Born
15 Jun 195725.1Ordained PriestPriest of Scranton, Pennsylvania, USA
7 Feb 199562.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Scranton, Pennsylvania, USA
7 Feb 199562.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Sufetula
7 Mar 199562.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sufetula
31 Aug 200977.3RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Scranton, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for John Martin Dougherty
Bishop John Martin Dougherty (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Scranton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceScranton

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Scranton.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 31 Aug 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Number 12,493

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast