Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Ayala, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ávila


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1676BornArenas de San Pedro
8 Mar 172851.5AppointedBishop of Ávila, Spain
30 May 172851.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ávila, Spain
23 Jun 173861.8ResignedBishop of Ávila, Spain
4 May 174265.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Ávila, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Ayala:
Bishop Pedro Ayala O.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ávila

  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 46, Number 184

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 2 Mar 2014