Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josef Ludwig Brems, O. Praem. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Denmark

Titular Bishop of Roskilde


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Aug 1870BornTestelt
9 Mar 189524.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Canons Regular of Premontre; Norbertines
10 Oct 192252.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Denmark
10 Oct 192252.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Roskilde
25 Jan 192352.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Roskilde
Nov 1938³68.2ResignedVicar Apostolic of Denmark
5 Apr 195887.6DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Denmark

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Josef Ludwig Brems:
Bishop Josef Ludwig Brems O. Praem. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Denmark

  • a priest for 63.0 years
  • a bishop for 35.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1923, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015