Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Petrus Innocentius Johannes Humbertus Verriet, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Curaçao, Netherlands Antilles, Antilles

Titular Bishop of Eleutherna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1880Born
13 Aug 190524.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
13 Nov 193151.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Curaçao, Netherlands Antilles, Antilles
13 Nov 193151.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Eleutherna
6 Jan 193251.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eleutherna
10 Mar 194867.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Curaçao, Netherlands Antilles, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Petrus Innocentius Johannes Humbertus Verriet
Bishop Petrus Innocentius Johannes Humbertus Verriet O.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Curaçao

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenray

  • a priest for 42.5 years
  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast