Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Hendrik Olav Smit

Deceased

Official of the Roman Curia - Other

Titular Bishop of Paralus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Feb 1883Born
15 Aug 190623.4Ordained PriestPriest
11 Apr 192239.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Norvegia (e Spitzbergen)
11 Apr 192239.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Paralus
29 Jun 192239.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Paralus
11 Oct 192845.6AppointedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other
23 Jun 197289.3DiedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Johannes Hendrik Olav Smit
Bishop Johannes Hendrik Olav Smit (born , died ) Official of Roman Curia - Other

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDeventer
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Campo Santo dei Tuetonici, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 65.8 years
  • a bishop for 49.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,922, Number 41
  • loc: CB, 17 Sep 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast