Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Linegar

Deceased

Archbishop of Dublin, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1671²Born
28 Dec 169423.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Dublin, Ireland
31 Dec 169423.9Ordained PriestPriest of Dublin, Ireland
9 Mar 173463.1SelectedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
20 Mar 173463.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
21 Jun 175786.4DiedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Linegar
Archbishop John Linegar (born 1671, died ) Archbishop of Dublin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBroadstone in Dublin, Archdiocese of Dublin
Buried Place (Original)St. Michan's churchyard

  • a priest for 62.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1734, Number 36
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 201
  • op: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 28 Aug 2020

Quantcast