Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerald John Mathias

Bishop of Lucknow, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1953 Born
22 Apr 197925.5Ordained PriestPriest of Lucknow, India
22 Dec 199946.2AppointedBishop of Simla and Chandigarh, India
9 Apr 200046.5Ordained BishopBishop of Simla and Chandigarh, India
8 Nov 200754.1AppointedBishop of Lucknow, India

MicroData Summary for Gerald John Mathias
(WikiData: Q1509925)
Bishop Gerald John Mathias (born ) Bishop of Lucknow

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKallianpur, Diocese of Mangalore
Ordained BishopOpen Air, Grounds of, Sacred Heart School, Chandigarh, Diocese of Simla and Chandigarh

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lucknow.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Nov 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,744

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024