Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paride de Grassis

Deceased

Bishop of Pesaro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1460¹Born
18 May 150444.3AppointedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other
4 Apr 151353.2AppointedBishop of Pesaro, Italy
16 May 151353.3Ordained BishopBishop of Pesaro, Italy
10 Jun 152868.4DiedBishop of Pesaro, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paride de Grassis (VIAF: 57455881)
Bishop Paride de Grassis (born 1460, died ) Bishop of Pesaro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBologna, Diocese of Bologna
Ordained BishopS. Lorenzo in Lucina, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 274
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1513, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 2 Jul 2018

Quantcast