Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Beccari (Becariis), O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of ShkodrŽ (Scutari), Albania


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Sep 1524AppointedBishop of ShkodrŽ (Scutari), Albania
16 Oct 1524Ordained BishopBishop of ShkodrŽ (Scutari), Albania
1543¹DiedBishop of ShkodrŽ (Scutari), Albania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Beccari (Becariis)
Bishop Antonio Beccari (Becariis) O.P. (died 1543) Bishop of ShkodrŽ (Scutari)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopChapel of the Consecrator, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceAncona, Diocese of Ancona e Numana, Italy

  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 294
  • ob/c2+: CB, 7 Jan 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1524, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast