Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mario Maffei

Deceased

Bishop of Cavaillon, France


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Nov 1516AppointedBishop of Aquino, Italy
24 May 1518Ordained BishopBishop of Aquino, Italy
9 Sep 1524AppointedBishop of Cavaillon, France
24 Jun 1537DiedBishop of Cavaillon, France

MicroData Summary for Mario Maffei
Bishop Mario Maffei (died ) Bishop of Cavaillon

EventPlace
Ordained BishopChapel of the Consecrator, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 161, and Page 114
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1518, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 6 Sep 2020

Quantcast