Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerolamo Sansoni

Deceased

Bishop of Lodi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1490¹Born
5 Nov 151121.8AppointedBishop of Arezzo, Italy
19 Nov 151929.8AppointedBishop of Lodi, Italy
25 Jul 152535.5Ordained BishopBishop of Lodi, Italy
1536²46.0DiedBishop of Lodi, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gerolamo Sansoni
Bishop Gerolamo Sansoni (born 1490, died 1536) Bishop of Lodi

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 10.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 116, and Page 220
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1525, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 11 Jun 2018

Quantcast