Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Guillén-Ramón Cardinal de Vich y de Valterra

Deceased

Bishop of Barcelona, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of San Marcello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1460¹Born
1 Jul 151757.5Elevated to Cardinal
13 Nov 151757.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Marcello
22 Oct 151858.8AppointedAdministrator of Cefalù, Italy
24 Jun 151959.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Barcelona, Spain
20 Mar 152161.2InstalledBishop of Barcelona, Spain
2 Jul 152161.5Ordained BishopBishop of Barcelona, Spain
7 Jun 152565.4ResignedAdministrator of Cefalù, Italy
27 Jul 152565.5DiedBishop of Barcelona, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guillén-Ramón de Vich y de Valterra
Guillén-Ramón Cardinal de Vich y de Valterra (born 1460, died ) Bishop of Barcelona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValencia, Diocese of Valencia
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 4.0 years
  • a cardinal for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Jul 1517
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 163
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 34, Number 146
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1521, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 8 Jun 2018

Quantcast