Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Filippo Trivulzio

Deceased

Archbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Mar 1521AppointedArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
21 Dec 1526Ordained BishopArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
27 Jun 1543DiedArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Filippo Trivulzio
Archbishop Filippo Trivulzio (died ) Archbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 281
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1526, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 12 Jun 2018

Quantcast