Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vicente de Peraza (Pirez), O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Panamá


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Dec 1520AppointedBishop of Panamá
1 Apr 1521Ordained BishopBishop of Panamá
15 Aug 1521InstalledBishop of Panamá
1526ResignedBishop of Panamá
1553²DiedBishop Emeritus of Panamá

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vicente de Peraza (Pirez):
Bishop Vicente de Peraza (Pirez) O.P. , Bishop Emeritus of Panamá

  • a bishop for 31.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c23: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 34, Number 145
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 268

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 12 Nov 2013