Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Deenihan

Bishop of Meath, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1967 Born
1 Apr 199022.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Cork and Ross, Ireland
1 Jun 199123.9Ordained PriestPriest of Cork and Ross, Ireland
18 Jun 201850.9AppointedBishop of Meath, Ireland
2 Sep 201851.1Ordained BishopBishop of Meath, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Thomas Deenihan
Bishop Thomas Deenihan (born ) Bishop of Meath

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBlackpool, Cork, Diocese of Cork and Ross
Ordained DeaconMaynooth
Ordained BishopChrist the King, Cathedral, Mullingar, Diocese of Meath

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Meath.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Jun 2018
  • od/c01: CB, 18 Jun 2018
  • ob: CB, 3 Jul 2018
  • c2+: CB, 9 Aug 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.0, 30 Aug 2018; Data: 3 Sep 2018

Quantcast