Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastião Soares de Resende

Deceased

Bishop of Beira, Mozambique


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1906Born
21 Oct 192822.3Ordained PriestPriest of Porto, Portugal
21 Apr 194336.8AppointedBishop of Beira, Mozambique
15 Aug 194337.1Ordained BishopBishop of Beira, Mozambique
25 Jan 196760.6DiedBishop of Beira, Mozambique

MicroData Summary for Sebastião Soares de Resende
Bishop Sebastião Soares de Resende (born , died ) Bishop of Beira

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilheiroz de Poiares, Portugal

  • a priest for 38.2 years
  • a bishop for 23.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1943, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast