Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-François d’Andigné de la Chasse

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chalons-sur-Saône


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1724BornRennes
6 Mar 176339.1SelectedBishop of Saint-Pol-de-Léon, France
18 Jul 176339.4ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Pol-de-Léon, France
21 Aug 176339.5Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Pol-de-Léon, France
24 Jun 177248.4SelectedBishop of Chalons-sur-Saône, France
27 Jul 177248.4ResignedBishop of Saint-Pol-de-Léon, France
7 Sep 177248.6ConfirmedBishop of Chalons-sur-Saône, France
7 Dec 178157.8ResignedBishop of Chalons-sur-Saône, France
12 Jul 180682.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Chalons-sur-Saône, France

MicroData Summary for Joseph-François d’Andigné de la Chasse:
Bishop Joseph-François d’Andigné de la Chasse (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chalons-sur-Saône

  • a bishop for 42.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1763, Number 23
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 136, and Page 259

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 11 Dec 2015