Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Louis de Gouyon de Vaudurand

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Pol-de-Léon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1702¹BornVannes
24 Apr 174543.3SelectedBishop of Saint-Pol-de-Léon, France
23 Aug 174543.6ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Pol-de-Léon, France
12 Sep 174543.6Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Pol-de-Léon, France
7 May 176361.3ResignedBishop of Saint-Pol-de-Léon, France
18 Jun 178078.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint-Pol-de-Léon, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Louis de Gouyon de Vaudurand:
Bishop Jean-Louis de Gouyon de Vaudurand (born 1702, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Pol-de-Léon

  • a bishop for 34.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1745, Number 16
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 259

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 29 Nov 2015