Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Atanasij Šeptycki (Czeptyski)

Deceased

Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian)

Bishop of Lviv (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1686¹BornVoshchatychi
1715¹29.0AppointedBishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
13 Sep 171529.6Ordained BishopBishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
1 Mar 172842.1SelectedCoadjutor Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
17 Aug 172943.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
12 Dec 174660.9DiedArchbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Atanasij Šeptycki (Czeptyski):
Archbishop Atanasij Šeptycki (Czeptyski) (died ) Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev}

  • a bishop for 31.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Number 15,533
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 269

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 16 Feb 2015