Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josyf Levyckyj, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Chełm (Ukrainian), Poland


Events

DateEventTitle
1711¹AppointedBishop of Chełm (Ukrainian), Poland
1711²AppointedAdministrator of Lutzk e Ostrog (Ukrainian), Ukraine
5 Jul 1711³Ordained BishopBishop of Chełm (Ukrainian), Poland
1713²ResignedAdministrator of Lutzk e Ostrog (Ukrainian), Ukraine
15 Jun 1730DiedBishop of Chełm (Ukrainian), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Josyf Levyckyj
Bishop Josyf Levyckyj O.S.B.M. (died ) Bishop of Chełm

  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: CB, 2 Jan 2014
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,025
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 264, and Page 303
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1711, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast