Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop György Gábor Blazsovszky, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian)

Titular Bishop of Agnus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1705¹BornBlažov
1729¹24.0Ordained PriestPriest of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
1738¹33.0ProfessedMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
14 Jan 173833.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
12 Sep 173833.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Agnus
27 Dec 173833.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Agnus
20 Dec 174237.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for György Gábor Blazsovszky
Bishop György Gábor Blazsovszky O.S.B.M. (born 1705, died ) Vicar Apostolic of Mukachevo (Munkács)

  • a priest for 13.9 years
  • a bishop for 3.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 70, and Page 453
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1738, Number 34
  • c1: CB, 1 Jun 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 3 Jun 2016