Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jurij (Jerzy) Bułhak

Deceased

Bishop of Pińsk-Turaŭ (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1699Born
Aug 1723³24.2Ordained PriestPriest
Mar 1730²30.8AppointedBishop of Pińsk-Turaŭ (Ukrainian), Belarus
5 Sep 173031.3Ordained BishopBishop of Pińsk-Turaŭ (Ukrainian), Belarus
10 May 1769²70.0DiedBishop of Pińsk-Turaŭ (Ukrainian), Belarus

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jurij (Jerzy) Bułhak:
Bishop Jurij (Jerzy) Bułhak (born , died ) Bishop of Pińsk-Turaŭ

  • a priest for 45.7 years
  • a bishop for 38.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Google Books, 2015, 2, 13
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,759
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 278
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1730

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015