Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jeronim Ustryckyj

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1658²Born
10 Dec 171557.9AppointedBishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
17 Dec 171557.9Ordained BishopBishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
1746²88.0ResignedBishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
12 Oct 174890.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jeronim Ustryckyj:
Bishop Jeronim Ustryckyj (born 1658, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok

  • a bishop for 32.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 273
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,755
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1715

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015