Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anastasij Szeptycki

Deceased

Bishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1723Born
17 Mar 174824.3Ordained PriestPriest
1762¹38.0AppointedBishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
19 Sep 176238.8Ordained BishopBishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
7 Jun 177955.5DiedBishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Anastasij Szeptycki:
Bishop Anastasij Szeptycki (born , died ) Bishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok

  • a priest for 31.2 years
  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,884
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 274
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1762, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Nov 2015