Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kornyliy (Korneliusz) Lebetskyi-Stolpovytskyi (Lebiecki), O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Volodymyr (Włodzimierz) et Brėst (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1689BornSlomin
1717²27.7Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
3 Sep 172940.4AppointedBishop of Volodymyr (Włodzimierz) et Brėst (Ukrainian)
11 Dec 172940.7Ordained BishopBishop of Volodymyr (Włodzimierz) et Brėst (Ukrainian)
22 Jan 173040.8DiedBishop of Volodymyr (Włodzimierz) et Brėst (Ukrainian)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Kornyliy (Korneliusz) Lebetskyi-Stolpovytskyi (Lebiecki):
Bishop Kornyliy (Korneliusz) Lebetskyi-Stolpovytskyi (Lebiecki) O.S.B.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Volodymyr (Włodzimierz) et Brėst

  • a priest for 13.0 years
  • a bishop for .1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Number 15,251
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 298
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1729, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015