Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Onufrij Šumljanškyj

Deceased

Bishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian)

Note/Previous Titular See: Sambir


Events

DateEventTitle
1739²AppointedTitular Bishop
1744²AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
22 Nov 1744Ordained BishopTitular Bishop
1746²SucceededBishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
1746²AppointedAdministrator of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
1749²ResignedAdministrator of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
20 Apr 1762DiedBishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Onufrij Šumljanškyj:
Bishop Onufrij Šumljanškyj (died ) Bishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok

  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 270, and Page 274
  • ob/c2: CB, 11 Jul 2015
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,527

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015