Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simon István Olsavszky, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian)

Titular Bishop of Pella

Member of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1692¹BornOlshavicja
1719¹27.0Ordained PriestPriest of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
26 Aug 173341.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
1735¹43.0ProfessedMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
20 May 173543.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Pella
24 Dec 173745.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Simon István Olsavszky
Bishop Simon István Olsavszky O.S.B.M. (born 1692, died ) Vicar Apostolic of Mukachevo (Munkács)

  • a priest for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 332
  • bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1735, Number 37
  • c1: CB, 1 Jun 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 3 Jun 2016