Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferenc Gossman

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Vác, Hungary

Titular Bishop of Castoria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1870Born
24 Jun 189424.4Ordained PriestPriest of Vác, Hungary
1 Jul 191343.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vác, Hungary
1 Jul 191343.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Castoria
5 Oct 191343.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castoria
11 Oct 193161.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Vác, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Ferenc Gossman
Bishop Ferenc Gossman (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Vác

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSoroksar
Ordained BishopVác, Diocese of Vác

  • a priest for 37.2 years
  • a bishop for 18.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1913, Number 57
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 33, Number 1,970

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast