Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gabriel Acacius Cardinal Coussa, B.A. †

Deceased

Secretary of the Congregation for the Oriental Churches

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Atanasio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1897BornAleppo, Syria
21 Nov 191417.2ProfessedMember of Ordre Basilien AlÚpin (Melkite Greek)
6 Jul 191820.9Solemn ProfessedMember of Ordre Basilien AlÚpin (Melkite Greek)
25 Dec 192023.3Ordained PriestPriest of Ordre Basilien AlÚpin (Melkite Greek)
21 Mar 193335.6AppointedOfficial of the Pontifical Commission for the Codification of Oriental Canon Law
16 Jul 193537.9AppointedSecretary of the Pontifical Commission for the Redaction of the Code of Oriental Canon Law
3 Mar 194648.5AppointedSecretary of the Pontifical Commission for the Authentic Interpretation of the Code of Canon Law
26 Feb 196163.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Hierapolis in Syria dei Greco-Melkiti
16 Apr 196163.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Hierapolis in Syria dei Greco-Melkiti
4 Aug 196164.0AppointedPro-Secretary of the Congregation for the Oriental Churches
19 Mar 196264.6Elevated to Cardinal
22 Mar 196264.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Atanasio
24 Mar 196264.6AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for the Oriental Churches
29 Jul 196264.9DiedSecretary of the Congregation for the Oriental Churches

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Acacius Coussa
Gabriel Acacius Cardinal Coussa B.A. (born , died ) Secretary of Oriental Churches

  • a priest for 41.5 years
  • a bishop for 1.2 years
  • a cardinal for .3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 1 May 2016