Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pontifical Commission for the Revision of the Code of Oriental Canon Law

Pontificia Commissio Codici Iuris Canonici Orientalis Recognoscendo

Suppressed

To: Pontifical Council for the Interpretation of Legislative Texts



Show: All | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Historical Details


Past Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Pontifical Commission for the Codification of Oriental Canon Law
Pontifical Commission for the Redaction of the Code of Oriental Canon Law
17 July 1935Name ChangedPontifical Commission for the Codification of Oriental Canon Law Pontifical Commission for the Redaction of the Code of Oriental Canon Law
Pontifical Commission for the Revision of the Code of Oriental Canon Law
10 June 1972Name ChangedPontifical Commission for the Redaction of the Code of Oriental Canon Law Pontifical Commission for the Revision of the Code of Oriental Canon Law
27 February 1991SuppressedPontifical Commission for the Revision of the Code of Oriental Canon Law (suppressed) Pontifical Council for the Interpretation of Legislative Texts

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_d, v3.1.6, 5 May 2016; Data: 21 Aug 2016