Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Aitape

Dioecesis Aitapensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Otto Separy, Bishop
  • Austen Robin Crapp, O.F.M., Bishop Emeritus

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Aitape
15 May 1952ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Central New Guinea Prefecture Apostolic of Aitape (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Aitape
11 November 1956ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Aitape Vicariate Apostolic of Aitape
13 September 1963Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Aitape Prefecture Apostolic of Vanimo (erected)
Diocese of Aitape
15 November 1966ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Aitape Diocese of Aitape

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Aitape
197037,56664,67658.1%329321,1734640ap1971
198044,40061,80071.8%322251,776345124ap1981
199052,32572,18372.5%327301,744526224ap1991
199963,00080,00078.8%423272,333504520ap2000
200063,50080,50078.9%420242,645426217ap2001
200165,40082,00079.8%420242,725426617ap2002
200269,40093,70274.1%619252,776476717ap2003
200370,00094,00074.5%817252,800436817ap2004
200472,00095,50075.4%717243,000406317ap2005
200673,30098,80074.2%1214262,819317123ap2007
201276,400117,80064.9%910194,021405522ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.1, 20 Jul 2013; data: 17 Aug 2013