Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gaetano Maria Garrasi, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Messina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1727BornCatane
19 Sep 175022.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
20 Jan 179264.1SelectedArchbishop of Messina, Italy
18 Jun 179264.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Messina, Italy
24 Jun 179264.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Messina, Italy
16 Feb 181789.2DiedArchbishop of Messina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gaetano Maria Garrasi
Archbishop Gaetano Maria Garrasi O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Archbishop of Messina

  • a priest for 66.4 years
  • a bishop for 24.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 287
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 21 Feb 2016