Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mercuriale (Bartolomeo) Prati, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Forli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1715Born
20 Sep 173822.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
25 Jun 178468.7AppointedBishop of Forli, Italy
27 Jun 178468.7Ordained BishopBishop of Forli, Italy
20 Oct 180691.0DiedBishop of Forli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Mercuriale (Bartolomeo) Prati
Bishop Mercuriale (Bartolomeo) Prati O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Forli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceForlž, Diocese of Forli

  • a priest for 68.0 years
  • a bishop for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 218
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1784, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast