Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Amoroso

Deceased

Archbishop of Lanciano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1746BornMarcianise
1 Jun 177630.0Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 179145.5SelectedArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy
27 Feb 179245.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy
4 Mar 179245.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy
8 Jul 180761.1DiedArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Amoroso
Archbishop Francesco Amoroso (born , died ) Archbishop of Lanciano

  • a priest for 31.1 years
  • a bishop for 15.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795, Page 92
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 251
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 21 Feb 2016