Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Rainieri Alliata

Deceased

Archbishop of Pisa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 May 1752³BornPisa
10 Jun 177523.0Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 179139.5AppointedBishop of Volterra, Italy
21 Dec 179139.5Ordained BishopBishop of Volterra, Italy
6 Oct 180654.3AppointedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy
11 Aug 1836³84.2DiedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Rainieri Alliata
Archbishop Rainieri Alliata (born , died ) Archbishop of Pisa

  • a priest for 61.1 years
  • a bishop for 44.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 307
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 16
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 445

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 21 Feb 2016