Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gioacchino Vassetta, Sch. P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Castellaneta, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1740Born
17 Mar 176424.0Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 179151.7SelectedBishop of Castellaneta, Italy
27 Feb 179251.9ConfirmedBishop of Castellaneta, Italy
4 Mar 179251.9Ordained BishopBishop of Castellaneta, Italy
1793¹52.8DiedBishop of Castellaneta, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gioacchino Vassetta
Bishop Gioacchino Vassetta Sch. P. (born , died 1793) Bishop of Castellaneta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVasto

  • a priest for 28.7 years
  • a bishop for .8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 153
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast